THE BEACON LIGHT LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 209010
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 April 2019 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 May 2018 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required