THE NEW CHURCH CHILDREN'S SOCIETY

Charity number: 209126
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £31.81k £29.64k £28.57k £32.06k £34.72k
Total expenditure £30.71k £27.54k £29.11k £26.79k £33.76k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A