Governing document ST LUKE'S HOSPITAL FOR THE CLERGY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION DATED 18TH MAY 1918. CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 4TH MAY 1949, 17TH MAY 1977, 15TH MAY 1981, 18 SEPT 2007, AND 18 JUNE 2008.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE MEDICAL AND SURGICAL TREATMENT AND A HOSPITAL FOR ANGLICAN (A) CLERGY OF THE COMMUNION AND OF THOSE CHURCHES IN FULL COMMUNION WITH IT, THEIR SPOUSES, WIDOWS, DEPENDANT CHILDREN AND OTHER RELATIVES AS APPROVED BY THE EXECUTIVE OR HOUSE COMMITTEE. (B) THEOLOGICAL STUDENTS WHO HAVE BEEN ACCEPTED AS CANDIDATES FOR HOLY ORDERS BY A BISHOP OF THE COMMUNION. (C) ORDAINED MEMBERS OF THE ORDER OF DEACONESSES. (D) MISSIONARIES. (E) WHOLE TIME LAY CHURCH WORKERS LICENSED BY A BISHOP. (F) MEMBERS OF RECOGNISED MONASTIC AND CONVENTIONAL ORDERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.