THE CHURCH LANDS

Charity number: 211409
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 29 JULY 1881, 19 DECEMBER 1905, 9 SEPTEMBER 1910 AND 20 MARCH 1962
Charitable objects
HALF INCOME APPLIED IN AUGMENTATION OF "THE CHURCH LANDS"; THE OTHER HALF APPLIED IN AUGMENTATION OF "SIR RICHARD COXE'S CHARITY". FUNDS TRANSFERRED TO THE CHURCH LANDS: COMMNRS' SCHEME OF 08/05/1986
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF ST. PETER ST. ALBANS AND ST. PAUL ST. ALBANS
Registration history
  • 21 November 1962 : Standard registration
  • 26 June 1993 : Removed