Accounts and annual returns THE DEPTFORD ST PAUL CHARITY

Charity number: 213171
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 18 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 13 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 13 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 22 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window