Trustees LOOSE AMENITIES ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 215701
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TERENCE NEIL DAVIS FRICS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sarah Harden | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola McAuley | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Wright | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Ellen Butler | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Kenny | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Humphrey Brighton | Trustee | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Scott Greenfield | Trustee | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Killington | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.