Financial history THE NATIONAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO CHILDREN

Charity number: 216401
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £127.41m £118.33m £117.90m £117.60m £121.82m
Total expenditure £121.12m £116.65m £114.56m £111.31m £112.50m
Income from government contracts £2.24m £1.98m £2.32m £2.24m £2.31m
Income from government grants £7.06m £7.93m £8.87m £8.89m £14.77m
Income - Donations and legacies £103.90m £97.22m £93.04m £93.52m £102.58m
Income - Other trading activities £9.69m £8.29m £11.11m £8.96m £4.49m
Income - Charitable activities £12.67m £11.51m £12.65m £13.61m £13.32m
Income - Endowments £23.76m £8.98m £0 £0 £2.71m
Income - Investment £1.07m £1.24m £1.10m £1.52m £1.43m
Income - Other £80.00k £70.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £25.08m £88.24m £19.66m £22.59m £22.39m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £90.96m £93.38m £89.74m £86.78m £83.28m
Expenditure - Raising funds £23.80m £22.73m £22.61m £22.10m £24.65m
Expenditure - Governance £530.00k £117.00k £427.11k £436.00k £438.10k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £1.35m £2.02m £2.45m £2.84m
Expenditure - Investment management £126.00k £184.19k £140.52k £323.00k £325.30k
Expenditure - Other £6.37m £542.00k £2.20m £2.44m £4.57m