THE INCORPORATED CATHOLIC TRUTH SOCIETY

Charity number: 218951
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 22 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 23 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 13 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 26 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 26 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 13 July 2016 On time Download