Accounts and annual returns GOODWICK OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 219006
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 05 July 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 July 2023 247 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 July 2023 612 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 July 2023 977 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1716 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1716 days