JOHN FRICKER'S CHARITY OF 1696

Charity number: 220019
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 19 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 19 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 10 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 10 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 27 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 27 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 07 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 07 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 07 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 07 February 2017 On time Download