Dogfen lywodraethu Friends of Eastbourne Hospital
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED ON 07/11/1984 AS AMENDED ON 08/11/1990 AS AMENDED ON 04/11/1992 AS AMENDED ON 21/10/2013 AS AMENDED ON 30 NOV 2016 as amended on 11 Dec 2019 as amended on 21 Nov 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RAISE VOLUNTARY FUNDS TO PROVIDE EXTRA AMENITIES AND SERVICES FOR THE PATIENTS AND STAFF OF ALL THE HOSPITALS UNDER THE CONTROL OF THE EASTBOURNE HOSPITAL NHS TRUST AND TO MAKE DONATIONS TO PROVIDE SUCH AMENITIES AND SERVICES FOR THE PATIENTS AND STAFF OF OTHER ESTABLISHMENTS WHICH USUALLY ACCOMMODATE OR FOR THE TIME BEING ARE ACCOMMODATING PATIENTS WHO NORMALLY RESIDE IN THE AREA SERVED BY THE EASTBOURNE HOSPITAL NHS TRUST. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CONSTITUION)
Maes buddion
EASTBOURNE HOSPITAL GROUP
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.