THE HULL & EAST YORKSHIRE CENTRE FOR THE DEAF

Charity number: 220773
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £47.35k £50.53k £47.03k £55.00k £45.76k
Total expenditure £91.41k £86.26k £83.04k £103.91k £83.96k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A