SEYMOUR FIELDHOUSE HOMES

Charity number: 221993
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER CORNFORD Chair 12 June 2014 None on record
Mr Mike Willmott Trustee 12 June 2014 None on record
Mr Bill Leech Trustee 14 July 2016 None on record
JOAN BUCKNALL Trustee 09 June 2013 None on record
MS Sue Norman Trustee 02 April 2015 None on record
MR PHIL HOLT Trustee None on record
NORMAN GASCOIGNE Trustee
EDGBASTON FOUNDATION Received: On time
Julia Perrin Trustee 23 October 2013 None on record