FRIENDS OF YORK MINSTER

Charity number: 222871
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £151.74k £226.93k £95.31k £192.12k £70.90k
Total expenditure £252.39k £314.03k £76.19k £345.30k £81.03k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A