Accounts and annual returns REVEREND MICHAEL SYDDALL'S CHARITY

Charity number: 223680
Charity reporting is overdue by 51 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 51 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 51 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 24 April 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 24 April 2023 359 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 21 April 2023 721 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 21 April 2023 1086 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required