THE VICTORIA INSTITUTION (KNOWN AS CLIVIGER VILLAGE HALL)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Social events, community gatherings, private & public meetings, exercise classes, film clubs, music and specialist groups for the benefit of the local, and wider, community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People
13 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lancashire
Governance
- 21 September 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ivor Emo | Chair | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jean Haycock | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Wilson | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mick Heys | Trustee | 12 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
MIRIAM SHORROCK | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alex Williams | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Marion Beck | Trustee | 02 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
MAGGIE CROOKS | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY SHALLIKER | Trustee | 12 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
ALAN SCHOLES | Trustee | 12 September 2011 |
|
|||||
Moya Duckworth | Trustee | 03 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Cosima Towneley | Trustee | 03 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Briggs | Trustee | 04 May 2006 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.21k | £66.30k | £28.89k | £21.66k | £52.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.98k | £93.17k | £15.61k | £9.41k | £59.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.49k | £17.57k | £10.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 May 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 July 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 July 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 July 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 July 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 17 May 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 17 May 2019 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 20 JUNE 1978 as amended on 26 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF CLIVIGER AS CONSTITUTED ON THE 30 MAY 1978 WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIOS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CLIVIGER AS CONSTITUTED ON THE 30 MAY 1908
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Applecross Drive
BURNLEY
BB10 4JP
- Phone:
- 01282454133
- Email:
- marion@mandmbeck.plus.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window