Financial history GRANTHAM ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 224721
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £115.69k £118.31k £119.35k £121.34k £141.67k
Total expenditure £93.20k £105.49k £99.46k £103.75k £117.33k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £10.00k £10.00k