CHRISTIAN SCIENCE VISITING NURSE SERVICE , LONDON FIELD

Charity number: 224860
Removed charity
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 FEBRUARY 1954 AND SCHEME OF 25 JUNE 1976 AS AMENDED 19 OCTOBER 1981 AND REVISED CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 NOVEMBER 1983 AS AMENDED 25 JULY 2005, 20 JULY 2006 AND 13TH DECEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE IN CASES OF NEED PERSONS WHO ARE CHRISTIAN SCIENTISTS RESIDENT IN GREATER LONDON AND IN SPECIAL CASES THE COUNTIES ADJOINING GREATER LONDON AND WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED OR INFIRM.
Organisation type
No information available
Registration history
  • 04 March 1964 : registered
  • 15 September 2006 : removed
Other names
  • LONDON VISITING NURSE SERVICE (Working name)
  • VISITING NURSE SERVICE FOR CHRISTIAN SCIENTISTS, LONDON FIELD (Previous name)
What the charity did
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helped
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helped
  • Provides Services