NEW VICTORY HALL

Charity number: 225178
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 16 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

10 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 16 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 May 2017 On time Download