CHARITY OF THOMAS ANNOTSON

Charity number: 225787
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 14 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 14 August 2020 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 14 August 2020 381 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 20 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 14 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required