Accounts and annual returns THE GENERAL SERVICE BOARD OF ALCOHOLICS ANONYMOUS (GREAT BRITAIN) LIMITED

Charity number: 226745
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 14 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 14 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 12 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 12 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 27 November 2020 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 30 November 2020 123 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 30 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 24 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 29 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window