Accounts and annual returns KEPIER ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 228764
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 14 June 2023 08 March 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 14 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 14 June 2022 08 March 2024 329 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 14 June 2021 08 March 2024 694 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 14 June 2020 08 March 2024 1059 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 14 June 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1563 days
Accounts and TAR 14 June 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1563 days