CHARLES BROOK CONVALESCENT FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Trustees use the yearly income of the Fund for the benefit of people convalescing after treatment as in-patients or out-patients of Huddersfield hospitals. Support may be of the following. Special foods, medicines or appliances. Household goods such as washing machines, fridges etc. Floor coverings, cleaning services. Clothing, bedding. Holiday for convalescence.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2023
People
5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Kirklees
Governance
- 15 April 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Rowe | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAUL GRENVILLE WHITE | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Joanna Hobson | Trustee | 12 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
JANE WRAGG | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOE HODGSON | Trustee | 10 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2019 | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.27k | £13.92k | £11.37k | £11.44k | £12.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.76k | £16.06k | £8.55k | £16.86k | £12.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 08 February 2024 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 29 September 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2019 | 24 September 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 12/2/1954
Charitable objects
(1) SUPPLY OF SPECIAL FOOD AND MEDICINES, MEDICAL COMFORTS, EXTRA BEDDING, FUEL AND MEDICAL AND SURGICAL APPLIANCES. (2) DOMESTIC HELP. (3) GRANTS OF MONEY TO DEFRAY THE EXPENSES OF CONVALESCENCE INCLUDING THE EXPENSE OF NECESSARY TRANSPORT. (4) PAYMENT OF GRANTS TO ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION PROVIDING SUCH BENEFITS FOR POOR PERSONS OBJECTS 1, 2, AND 3 PREFERENCE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE IN OR OUT PATIENTS OF THE HUDDERSFIELD ROYAL INFIRMARY.
Area of benefit
HUDDERSFIELD AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
MISTAL BARN
ALMONDBURY
HUDDERSFIELD
HD4 6TA
- Phone:
- 01484 532183
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window