LAUNCELLS VILLAGE HALL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village hall for the benefit of the inhabitants of Launcells and district with the object of improving the conditions of life for said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Total income includes £10,667 from 2 government grant(s)
People
10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
- Devon
Governance
- 07 October 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARLENE ELIZABETH BATH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ALISON JUNE BUTLER | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
MANDY JANE POLLARD | Trustee | 12 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN PETER POLLARD | Trustee | 30 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE LOUISE NUNN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GRAHAM NEIL TAPE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
THE PARISH COUNCIL OF LAUNCELLS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN MARY URWIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VALERIE HOPPER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JACQUIE JOHNS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.59k | £3.72k | £6.85k | £19.94k | £19.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.54k | £3.83k | £8.51k | £3.00k | £14.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £19.60k | £10.67k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 97 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 97 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 07 November 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 18 APRIL 1962
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LAUNCELLS AND DISTRICT, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
LAUNCELLS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Burn Farm
Bridgerule
Holsworthy
EX22 7EZ
- Phone:
- 01288381288
- Email:
- burn.farm@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window