Financial history STRATTON ST MARGARET WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity number: 229896
Charity reporting is overdue by 211 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £6.32k £5.12k £4.99k £4.62k £3.63k
Total expenditure £5.66k £4.21k £4.09k £1.69k £1.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A