Trustees STRATTON ST MARGARET WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity number: 229896
Charity reporting is overdue by 205 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KATHLEEN JOYCE CATTELL Chair 08 May 2013
None on record
Brenda Joyce Broadbridge Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Susan O'Neil Trustee 19 February 2020
None on record
Shirley Gillard Trustee 19 February 2020
None on record
Angela Batten Trustee 19 April 2015
None on record
SUE COVELL Trustee 20 March 2009
None on record