THE SOCIETY OF ANTIQUARIES OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE

Charity number: 230888
Removed charity
Governing document
STATUTES OF THE SOCIETY ORIGINALLY DATED 1813, AS AMENDED 1952, 27 MARCH 1991, 25 MARCH 1992, 28 JANUARY 1998 AND 26 JANUARY 2005.
Charitable objects
THE STUDY, INVESTIGATION, DESCRIPTION AND PRESERVATION OF ANTIQUITIES AND HISTORICAL RECORDS IN GENERAL AND OF THOSE IN NORTHUMBERLAND DURHAM AND NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE IN PARTICULAR.
Organisation type
Other
Registration history
  • 30 June 1964 : registered
  • 27 January 2021 : removed (AMALGAMATED)
Other names

No other names

What the charity did
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helped
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helped
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research