Accounts and annual returns ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS TAMESIDE AND GLOSSOP BRANCH

Charity number: 232260
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 08 July 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 08 July 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 14 July 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 03 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 01 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window