Financial history THE ABBEYFIELD HOYLAKE AND WEST KIRBY SOCIETY LTD

Charity number: 233269
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.04m £966.01k £1.21m £1.15m £1.07m
Total expenditure £1.00m £959.17k £1.18m £1.21m £1.02m
Income from government contracts £105.00k £206.86k £210.62k £203.47k £15.14k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £65.62k
Income - Donations and legacies £8.41k £5.60k £82.61k £2.62k £104.57k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £999.57k £938.15k £1.11m £1.13m £881.24k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £9.41k £22.26k £15.03k £8.86k £13.49k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £8.90k £69.35k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.00m £959.17k £1.18m £1.21m £1.02m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £10.56k £8.88k £19.34k £26.21k £6.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0