Financial history SOCIETY OF GENEALOGISTS

Charity number: 233701
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £601.30k £734.79k £684.35k £3.96m £2.49m
Total expenditure £577.00k £656.44k £628.77k £710.63k £1.79m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £26.65k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £63.34k £131.39k £171.06k £130.40k £1.97m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £536.09k £595.70k £504.11k £494.69k £488.91k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.88k £1.26k £2.13k £1.21k £836
Income - Other £0 £6.43k £7.06k £3.33m £31.74k
Income - Legacies £51.24k £102.55k £130.00k £57.60k £1.86m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £575.82k £654.54k £626.76k £705.81k £1.78m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.18k £1.90k £2.02k £4.82k £4.07k
Expenditure - Governance £23.69k £21.46k £0 £16.36k £21.17k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0