JOHN A THOMPSON MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 235784
Charity reporting is up to date (66 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 January 2021 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 05 January 2021 66 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 20 November 2018 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 November 2018 20 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 31 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 31 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 19 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 19 October 2016 On time Download