Governing document Homeopathy UK
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 MAY 1909 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF 30 OCTOBER 1973, 10 OCTOBER 1974, 27 JULY 2000, 18 JANUARY 2001 AND 29 SEPTEMBER 2005. as amended on 23 Oct 2018 as amended on 08 May 2019
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE AND DEVELOP THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF HOMEOPATHY (B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RESEARCH IN THE THEORY AND PRACTICE OF HOMEOPATHY PROVIDED THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH SHALL BE PUBLISHED
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.