CHIPPING SODBURY TOWN LANDS CHARITY

Charity number: 236364
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 08 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 03 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 26 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 July 2017 On time Download