Trustees COMMON PLOT CHARITY
Charity number: 236752
Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR PETER GORDON HAMILTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sallie Tams | Trustee | 30 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clive Thornicroft | Trustee | 30 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Martin ROBINSON | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Peter Richard Stevens | Trustee | 05 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tom Kelt | Trustee | 15 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lin Davies | Trustee | 15 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sue Potts | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gideon Roberts | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Powell | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Leigh | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Mardling | Trustee | 14 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Rob Kenney | Trustee | 04 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Potts | Trustee | 25 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARK Leslie GREEN | Trustee | 25 April 2012 |
|
|||||
JILL HOOD | Trustee |
|
||||||
JAMES MICHAEL WHITE | Trustee |
|
||||||
ELIZABETH DOREEN SHIRLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LYNNE BAKKER COLLIER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER ROYCROFT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.