Accounts and annual returns CANONESSES REGULAR OF SAINT AUGUSTINE OF THE PRIORY OF OUR LADY OF GOOD COUNSEL

Charity number: 236981
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 16 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 05 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window