Financial history DANSKE KIRKE I LONDON (DANISH CHURCH IN LONDON)

Charity number: 237897
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £719.78k £462.21k £1.91m £860.28k £487.88k
Total expenditure £507.25k £714.87k £839.20k £2.14m £793.57k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £546.53k N/A £1.76m £758.98k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £128.99k N/A £19.37k £37.07k N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £77.98k £19.84k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £9.92k N/A
Income - Investment £44.26k N/A £51.30k £44.40k N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £439.36k N/A £796.61k £2.11m N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £67.90k N/A £42.58k £25.31k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £13.06k N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £4.42k N/A £5.81k £6.66k N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A