Trustees TREORCHY MALE CHOIR
Charity number: 239500
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gareth Richard Limbrick | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Raymond Barrey | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Williams | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
William James Thomas | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Glyndwr Geoffrey Rees | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Milsom | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Charles Clements | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Coleman | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Norman James Cox | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
GARETH EVANS | Trustee | 06 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Raymond John Daniels | Trustee | 23 March 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.