THE CHANTRY BOOK

Charity number: 242306
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 22 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 21 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 25 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 23 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 26 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required