THE CHANTRY BOOK

Charity number: 242306
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £1.17k £1.23k £1.28k £1.37k £1.35k
Total expenditure £1.17k £1.23k £1.28k £1.37k £1.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A