OXFORD AND DISTRICT CLUB FOR THE HARD OF HEARING

Charity number: 242702
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 April 2021 152 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 12 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 01 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required