WATKINSON ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 247894
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 March 2021 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required