THE CHELMSFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE

Charity number: 249505
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £23.86m £23.76m £25.08m £24.11m £23.02m
Total expenditure £22.29m £22.67m £25.27m £21.77m £23.27m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £18.82m £18.82m £20.51m £19.18m £19.62m
Income - Other trading activities £837.00k £835.00k £942.00k £969.00k £603.00k
Income - Charitable activities £1.97m £1.84m £1.96m £1.89m £1.33m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.86m £1.81m £1.66m £1.55m £1.46m
Income - Other £373.00k £462.00k £0 £525.00k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £21.49m £22.09m £24.73m £21.20m £23.05m
Expenditure - Raising funds £796.00k £584.00k £541.00k £573.00k £217.00k
Expenditure - Governance £57.00k £52.00k £52.00k £56.00k £36.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.98m £2.35m £2.81m £2.23m £1.64m
Expenditure - Investment management £239.00k £217.00k £234.00k £263.00k £217.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0