Financial history THE SOUTH LONDON CHURCH FUND AND SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE

Charity number: 249678
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £24.95m £25.87m £27.15m £24.60m £25.28m
Total expenditure £21.26m £22.40m £24.10m £20.71m £23.90m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £17.98m £18.08m £18.85m £19.17m £20.61m
Income - Other trading activities £122.00k £0 £125.85k £148.03k £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.32m £1.21m £1.35m £1.36m £1.10m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £853.00k
Income - Investment £2.54m £2.35m £2.37m £2.36m £1.90m
Income - Other £2.99m £4.22m £4.45m £1.57m £1.68m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £166.03k £76.26k £38.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £21.22m £22.37m £24.07m £20.69m £23.88m
Expenditure - Raising funds £42.00k £35.26k £21.68k £24.25k £24.00k
Expenditure - Governance £96.00k £90.53k £12.15k £96.35k £95.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.18m £2.22m £2.50m £2.47m £2.52m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £35.26k £21.68k £24.25k £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0