Governing document FAMILY PLANNING ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 250187
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 SEPTEMBER 1966 AS AMENDED 12 JUNE 1969, 30 OCTOBER 1969, 24 JUNE 1971, 24 JUNE 1976, 20 JANUARY 1977, 26 MARCH 1991 AND 14 OCTOBER 1993 AND 21 NOVEMBER 1997 AND 9TH DECEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION, PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL, AND THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF POOR SEXUAL HEALTH.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.