Accounts and annual returns NEWPORT YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION (INCORPORATING CENTRAL AND PILL YMCA'S)
Charity number: 250204
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | Not submitted |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window