Governing document MERSEY KIDNEY RESEARCH
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 FEBRUARY 1965 AS AMENDED 14 APRIL 1986, 21 NOVEMBER 1988, 24 APRIL 1991, 22 JUNE 1992 AND 29 MARCH 2004
Charitable objects
(A)TO UNDERTAKE, PROMOTE, DEVELOP AND ENCOURAGE RESEARCH INTO DISEASES OF THE KIDNEY AND URINARY TRACT AND RESEARCH INTO THE TREATMENT OF SUCH DISEASES; (B)TO UNDERTAKE, PROMOTE AND DEVELOP TREATMENT OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM DISEASES OF THE KIDNEY AND URINARY TRACT; (C)TO UNDERTAKE, PROMOTE AND DEVELOP METHODS ENABLING THOSE WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN UNDER TREATMENT FOR CHRONIC RENAL DISEASE TO BE MEDICALLY REHABILITATED;
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.