Financial history WESTLEIGH OLD PEOPLES WELFARE CENTRE

Charity number: 251949
Charity reporting is overdue by 1612 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 02/04/2007 05/04/2008 05/04/2009 01/04/2010 11/04/2011
Total gross income £10.15k £10.03k £10.03k £5.56k £7.30k
Total expenditure £10.65k £11.63k £11.63k £7.25k £7.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A