Linked charities PLYMOUTH HIGHBURY TRUST
Charity number: 252165
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 26TH NOVEMBER 1975 AS AMENDED 26 NOVEMBER 2003 AND 25 JANUARY 2006.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE, ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF, AND ADVANCE RELIGION AMONG THE MENTALLY HANDICAPPED.
Area of benefit
PLYMOUTH, DEVON
Registration history
- 29 September 2005 : Standard registration
- 18 May 2022 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.