Accounts and annual returns FRANKGIVING LIMITED

Charity number: 252370
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021
Annual return 30 June 2020 30 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 30 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 27 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 27 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 17 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 17 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 19 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 19 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window