Trustees DEVONSHIRE ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, LITERATURE AND THE ARTS
Charity number: 252468
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor William Hamilton | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Norman | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Joy Harland | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charles John Haslam | Trustee | 03 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Whittaker | Trustee | 04 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
DEREK WILLIAM SMITHERS | Trustee | 03 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
DR Ian Varndell | Trustee | 02 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Stella Diane Beavan | Trustee | 02 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Pocock | Trustee | 03 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Susan Andrew | Trustee | 06 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR MALCOLM BARRIE HART | Trustee | 18 June 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.